Financial history SIDCUP ROTARY CLUB BENEVOLENT TRUST

Charity number: 280561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £27.10k £56.02k £38.07k £302.58k £71.28k
Total expenditure £40.46k £75.85k £64.18k £22.31k £67.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A