ST MERRYN PARISH HALL AND INSTITUTE

Charity number: 280816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.97k £6.51k £7.95k £7.93k £12.64k
Total expenditure £11.05k £5.42k £6.45k £5.44k £6.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £320
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.33k