Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF HARLOW TRUST FUND

Charity number: 280915
Charity reporting is overdue by 754 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018
Total gross income £16.89k £6.57k £6.81k £12.25k £5.74k
Total expenditure £10.03k £9.20k £5.73k £7.15k £6.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A