THE ARTS SOCIETY OF WEST SUFFOLK

Charity number: 281081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.90k £19.49k £12.00k £13.54k £9.86k
Total expenditure £14.99k £16.01k £6.21k £12.92k £9.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A