Financial history THE BRITISH ECOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 281213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £4.59m £6.53m £4.63m £5.35m £5.39m
Total expenditure £4.06m £4.77m £3.99m £4.30m £4.52m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £136.00k £129.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £12.00k £38.00k £37.00k £419.00k £187.00k
Income - Other trading activities £84.00k £0 £0 £60.00k £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.30m £4.61m £4.47m £4.74m £5.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £37.00k £222.00k £0
Income - Investment £193.00k £176.00k £105.00k £130.00k £157.00k
Income - Other £0 £1.70m £17.00k £0 £20.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.02m £4.75m £3.97m £4.24m £4.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £39.00k £22.00k £24.00k £54.00k £56.00k
Expenditure - Governance £12.00k £13.00k £14.00k £13.00k £16.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £39.00k £22.00k £24.00k £3.00k £56.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0