Trustees PRIOR PARK EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity number: 281242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Robert Leach | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David William Catlow | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
NIcholas Dowler | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Costello | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Helen Humphries | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANNE MOORE | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Head | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Antonio Maria Alves | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nigel Rawlinson | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE SINGLETON | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE Elizabeth SHEPHERD | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.