Financial history Portesham Village Hall

Charity number: 281514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £32.99k £12.61k £12.94k £19.09k £19.86k
Total expenditure £12.89k £22.06k £13.85k £15.82k £9.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £17.43k