Financial history SPRINGWOOD TRUST

Charity number: 281558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £28.03k £26.87k £23.98k £27.44k £27.84k
Total expenditure £28.93k £30.62k £29.31k £29.86k £30.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A