Trustees THE BIG C APPEAL LIMITED
Charity number: 281730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bethany Kay Gammage | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Rebecca Smith MP | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Amanda Vincent | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Noreen Cushen-Brewster | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paige Olivia Gouldthorpe | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kristian Bowles | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Marie Johnson | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denise Margaret Troughton | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Suzanne Cordingley | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dylan Richard Warrilow Edwards | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Martin | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON GEOFFREY CROCKER | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.