ST PETER'S INDEPENDENT SCHOOL NORTHAMPTON

Charity number: 281736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £674.64k £705.54k £679.42k £653.45k £450.32k
Total expenditure £657.23k £835.20k £703.02k £614.69k £523.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £474 £50 £1.55k £1.05k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £674.17k £705.49k £677.87k £652.40k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £653.55k £835.20k £703.02k £614.69k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.67k £1.80k £1.80k £1.80k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A