Trustees THE ARTS SOCIETY SURREY HILLS
Charity number: 281822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Camp | Chair | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Riddell Heine-Carmichael | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lavinia Shaw-Brown | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janis Bridget Nottingham | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judith Downing | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Bruce Morley | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CAMP | Trustee | 02 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE TOWNSEND | Trustee | 22 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
GAIL GAISFORD | Trustee | 22 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
LORNA MARGARET Embleton | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.