THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S PERIVALE

Charity number: 281982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £65.31k £72.60k £70.58k £67.29k £94.67k
Total expenditure £56.29k £57.12k £67.41k £57.15k £68.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A