METROPOLITAN POLICE STAFF WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 282375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.94k £28.43k £20.17k £19.79k £20.63k
Total expenditure £13.44k £25.17k £19.82k £30.72k £37.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A