Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S RUSHDEN

Charity number: 282473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £543 £604 £1.08k £612 £544
Total expenditure £2.59k £925 £1.33k £398 £154
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A