ST KEYNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 282564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 10 November 2021 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 11 August 2019 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 05 April 2018 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required