Financial history ECUMENICAL SOCIETY OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY

Charity number: 282748
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £1.72k £1.29k £1.21k £1.01k £903
Total expenditure £3.17k £917 £413 £135 £135
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A