THE DORSET HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 282790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £109.10k £143.15k £163.15k £202.04k £142.96k
Total expenditure £133.01k £146.09k £207.30k £137.75k £173.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A