Governing document SOUTHERN SKIRMISH ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 282888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND REGULATIONS ADOPTED 1ST JUNE 1981 AND AMENDED 29 JANUARY 1995, 26 JANUARY 1997, 25TH JANUARY 1998 31ST JANUARY 1999 AND 22 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED ON 29 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE AMERICAN CIVIL WAR.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNDEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.