St. Michael's Exeter Parent Teacher Friends Association

Charity number: 282894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £5.89k £9.80k £8.89k £5.42k £9.12k
Total expenditure £7.39k £7.89k £10.67k £2.33k £11.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A