BODMIN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 283123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.36k £4.58k £0 £3.95k £2.17k
Total expenditure £6.49k £6.38k £0 £0 £5.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A