Financial history M AND S STORFER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 283151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £150.21k £204.08k £442.81k £217.33k £108.45k
Total expenditure £124.40k £147.95k £451.58k £248.10k £141.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A