Financial history OTSER GEMILLUS CHASODIM

Charity number: 283256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.81k £21.85k £27.77k £36.80k £25.22k
Total expenditure £22.21k £17.59k £33.43k £35.47k £27.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A