Trustees Mildenhall and Newmarket Sea Cadets Unit No 574 of the Sea Cadets Corps
Charity number: 283391
Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David William Bowman | Chair | 31 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Jane Marie Busuttil | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy-Jane Hitchcock | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon McKeown | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Samiec | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.