Financial history FRIENDS OF RICHARD CLOUDESLEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 283466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £20.59k £14.98k £9.25k £18.79k £3.45k
Total expenditure £11.49k £11.91k £11.35k £17.08k £8.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A