SOCIETY FOR JEWISH STUDY

Charity number: 283732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.21k £2.88k £2.95k £1.52k £1.41k
Total expenditure £2.63k £2.72k £2.95k £2.85k £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A