THE LONDON MARATHON CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 283813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 05 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 05 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 11 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 02 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 02 March 2017 On time Download