THE LONDON MARATHON CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 283813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £36.05m £36.13m £43.06m £48.17m £23.37m
Total expenditure £32.36m £35.82m £42.62m £51.16m £26.41m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £685.11k £615.32k £993.31k £656.73k £1.60m
Income - Other trading activities £35.22m £35.40m £41.96m £47.26m £21.57m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £141.57k £114.73k £100.49k £249.47k £194.09k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.47m £4.93m £8.42m £12.26m £5.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £28.90m £30.89m £34.20m £38.90m £21.22m
Expenditure - Governance £20.78k £24.85k £24.64k £35.28k £31.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.25m £4.65m £8.04m £11.59m £4.43m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £81.84k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0