WESTON-SUPER-MARE PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF THE ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES GRAND LODGE OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 284043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.12k £4.92k £4.25k £4.25k £3.66k
Total expenditure £2.39k £2.59k £5.85k £3.31k £2.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A