Accounts and annual returns GRACE CHARITY

Charity number: 284216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 22 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window