Financial history GRACE CHARITY

Charity number: 284216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £32.57k £36.05k £38.52k £40.33k £31.32k
Total expenditure £24.24k £35.98k £40.35k £29.03k £43.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A