Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE HEART FOUNDATION OF JAMAICA LIMITED

Charity number: 284408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 28 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 27 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 21 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2016 19 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 19 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window