Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE HEART FOUNDATION OF JAMAICA LIMITED

Charity number: 284408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £37.12k £41.81k £40.48k £33.01k £21.99k
Total expenditure £29.01k £45.45k £39.26k £34.26k £21.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A