Financial history THE MEDICAL AID FOR POLAND FUND

Charity number: 284461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £150.84k £85.33k £65.73k £93.38k £54.83k
Total expenditure £174.27k £147.79k £180.75k £220.05k £165.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £22.88k