Financial history THE BRITAIN-BURMA BUDDHIST TRUST

Charity number: 284619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £23.82k £8.85k £7.13k £9.14k £8.57k
Total expenditure £18.92k £8.71k £12.99k £11.29k £9.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A