Trustees THE BRITAIN-BURMA BUDDHIST TRUST

Charity number: 284619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr KYI TUN Chair 13 September 2009
None on record
Kaung Nyunt Soe Trustee 12 June 2016
None on record
Dr TIN TIN LWIN Trustee 25 June 2006
None on record
Patricia Khin Gray Trustee 02 April 1998
None on record
Dr LAY MAUNG Trustee 26 May 1995
None on record