Financial history THE KILACZYCKI FOUNDATION POLISH CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY ASSOCIATION VERITAS

Charity number: 284657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £30 £35 £138 £169 £41
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £1.50k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A