THE ARTS SOCIETY COTSWOLDS

Charity number: 284674
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 12 October 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 17 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 10 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 15 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 Not Required