Accounts and annual returns RAYLEIGH MILL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 284882
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 23 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required