Financial history RAYLEIGH MILL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 284882
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 23/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £19.58k £16.23k £19.45k £21.40k £13.28k
Total expenditure £21.69k £18.33k £19.05k £22.05k £12.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £135 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k