Accounts and annual returns PRIORY YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 284924
Charity reporting is overdue by 1001 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 270 days
Accounts and TAR 07 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 270 days
Annual return 07 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 635 days
Accounts and TAR 07 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 635 days
Annual return 07 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1001 days
Accounts and TAR 07 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1001 days
Annual return 07 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 07 March 2017 06 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 March 2017 Not Required