Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL ALBERT HALL TRUST

Charity number: 285111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window