CHICHESTER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY SUPPORT WORK

Charity number: 285337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £331.96k £727.67k £770.14k £781.87k £998.60k
Total expenditure £780.48k £582.71k £895.88k £897.80k £844.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.56k £0 £850 £5.53k £125.93k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £613.16k £577.75k £519.03k £795.87k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £66.40k £83.40k £80.62k £38.66k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £46.30k £61.69k £123.30k £103.88k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £1.82k £47.30k £58.93k £60.06k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £130
Income - Legacies N/A £188.21k £200.06k £177.66k £17.38k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £471.83k £715.01k £713.36k £671.42k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £110.88k £118.83k £124.85k £173.55k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.16k £1.26k £1.35k £2.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £62.04k £59.59k £0