Financial history THE RIX-THOMPSON-ROTHENBERG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 285368
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £151.43k £131.39k £155.73k £160.97k £147.27k
Total expenditure £170.97k £174.96k £165.04k £170.23k £147.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A