CENTRAL SCHOOL OF BALLET CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 285398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 14 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 14 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 08 May 2017 On time Download