CENTRAL SCHOOL OF BALLET CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 285398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Heidi Ann Hall Trustee 09 March 2020
BALLET BLACK Received: On time
PIM BAXTER OBE Trustee 25 September 2013 None on record
Christopher Hampson Trustee 17 October 2018
BALLET BLACK Received: On time
ANDREW MARMADUKE LANE TUCKEY Trustee
THE CHRISTOPHER GABLE CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Tim Parsonson Trustee 29 April 2015 None on record
JONATHAN PAUL WOOD Trustee
THE SERPENTINE TRUST Received: On time
THE CHRISTOPHER GABLE CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
COUNCIL FOR DANCE, DRAMA AND MUSICAL THEATRE Received: On time
TAMAS WOOD Trustee 11 July 2013
THE CONSERVATOIRE FOR DANCE AND DRAMA Received: On time
RALPH MITCHELL BERNARD CBE Chair
THE SHAKESPEARE BIRTHPLACE TRUST Received: On time
DAVID GRAY Trustee None on record
SIMON SPORBORG Trustee None on record
SIMON COLE Trustee None on record
CHARLOTTE SCHONBERG Trustee 30 October 2012 None on record
Susan Scott-Parker OBE Trustee
LIGHT FOR THE WORLD CIO Received: On time
Dr VIRGINIA BROOKE Trustee None on record
STEPHEN KANE Trustee None on record
WENDY PALLOT Trustee None on record