THE HENBURY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 285459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.19k £8.15k £8.00k £9.10k £7.59k
Total expenditure £14.20k £8.94k £9.04k £9.69k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A