THE NORWOOD SOCIETY

Charity number: 285547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.43k £4.28k £6.51k £5.41k £4.47k
Total expenditure £3.67k £6.87k £5.00k £7.85k £5.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A