Trustees 11TH FOLKESTONE (ST JOHN'S) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 285558

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR STEVE FAIRFAX | Chair |
|
||||||
Rebecca Ingelbrecht | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abbey Sutton | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Woodsford | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Marshall | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Sutton | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ingelbrecht | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Marshall | Trustee | 25 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE WARD | Trustee | 22 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Sutton | Trustee | 20 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Maite Last | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD HOGBEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CRAIG IAIN WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.