THE FRIENDS OF ASHLEY ST MARY

Charity number: 285658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £916 £1.06k £726 £1.18k £297
Total expenditure £541 £687 £464 £465 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A