THE INNER TEMPLE SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 285942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £81.93k £82.46k £68.52k £69.16k £64.02k
Total expenditure £81.93k £82.46k £68.52k £157.28k £108.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A